MN HF1455 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 148 03/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 148 03/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Blue Earth County; library board made advisory to the county board.
Title
Blue Earth County; library board made advisory to the county board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House: Passage (Y: 119 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Secretary of State Chapter 148 03/25/14 | |
2014-03-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-03-25 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-03-25 | Governor approval | |
2014-03-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-03-21 | House | Returned from Senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 64-0 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Special Order |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1275 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1275, now on General Orders |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill was passed vote: 119-6 |
2014-03-10 | House | Third reading |
2014-03-06 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 10, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | House | Second reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2013-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |