MN HF1285 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer-directed community supports modified, consumer-directed community support onetime grant program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Consumer-directed community supports modified, consumer-directed community support onetime grant program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Fischer |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Hamilton |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1250 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy