MI SB1127 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 628'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 628'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; community colleges; nominating petition filing deadline for certain board of trustee candidates; modify. Amends sec. 83 of 1966 PA 331 (MCL 389.83).
Title
Higher education; community colleges; nominating petition filing deadline for certain board of trustee candidates; modify. Amends sec. 83 of 1966 PA 331 (MCL 389.83).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 937 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 702 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 702 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 628'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 6:08 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2018 @ 4:35 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2018 @ 12:44 Pm |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 937 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Received On 12/06/2018 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 702 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |
Subjects
Elections: local
Elections: petitions
Higher education: community colleges
Higher education: governing boards
Elections: petitions
Higher education: community colleges
Higher education: governing boards