MI SB0619 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Assigned Pa 0037'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Assigned Pa 0037'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use tax; collections; deposit of certain amount from general fund to Michigan promotion fund; provide for. Amends sec. 21 of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.111).
Title
Use tax; collections; deposit of certain amount from general fund to Michigan promotion fund; provide for. Amends sec. 21 of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.111).
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Assigned Pa 0037'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-04-13 | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/31/2010 @ 1:45 Pm | |
2010-04-13 | Approved By Governor 3/31/2010 @ 1:29 Pm | |
2010-04-13 | Presented To Governor 3/30/2010 @ 3:26 Pm | |
2010-03-25 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-03-25 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-03-25 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-03-25 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-03-25 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-03-25 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-03-25 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 122 Yeas 97 Nays 12 | |
2010-03-25 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-03-25 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-03-25 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-03-09 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2010-03-03 | Referred To Committee On Tourism, Outdoor Recreation And Natural Resources | |
2010-03-03 | Read A First Time | |
2010-03-03 | Received On 03/03/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Passed Roll Call # 72 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-03-03 | Substitute S-2 Defeated | |
2010-03-03 | Amendment(s) Defeated | |
2010-02-24 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-02-24 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-02-24 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-02-23 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-02-23 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-02-23 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-06-03 | Referred To Committee On Finance |