MI SB0436 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-18 - Referred To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment
Pending: House Great Lakes And Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-18 - Referred To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment
Pending: House Great Lakes And Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; permits; private sector review of certain environmental permits; establish. Amends secs. 1307 & 1311 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.1307 & 324.1311) & adds sec. 1313.
Title
Environmental protection; permits; private sector review of certain environmental permits; establish. Amends secs. 1307 & 1311 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.1307 & 324.1311) & adds sec. 1313.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-18 | Referred To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment | |
2009-06-18 | Read A First Time | |
2009-06-18 | Received On 06/18/2009 | |
2009-06-18 | Passed Roll Call # 271 Yeas 19 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-06-18 | Amendment(s) Defeated | |
2009-06-18 | Postponed Temporarily | |
2009-06-18 | Amendment(s) Defeated | |
2009-06-18 | Vote Reconsidered | |
2009-06-17 | Postponed Temporarily | |
2009-06-17 | Amendment(s) Adopted | |
2009-06-16 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-06-16 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-06-16 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-06-09 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-06-09 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-06-09 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-04-02 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform |