MI SB0322 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Presented To Governor 01/14/2020 10:22 Am
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Counties; boards and commissions; transfer of functions of a county road commission to the county board of commissioners; remove sunset. Amends sec. 11 of 1851 PA 156 (MCL 46.11).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties; boards and commissions; transfer of functions of a county road commission to the county board of commissioners; remove sunset. Amends sec. 11 of 1851 PA 156 (MCL 46.11).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 374 (Y: 77 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 170 (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenatePresented To Governor 01/14/2020 10:22 Am
2020-01-08SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-01-08SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2019-12-11HouseReturned To Senate
2019-12-11HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 374 Yeas 77 Nays 31 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-12-11HouseRead A Third Time
2019-12-11HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-12-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-12-11HouseRead A Second Time
2019-09-18HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-09-18HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-09-18HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-08-28HouseReferred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
2019-08-28HouseRead A First Time
2019-08-28HouseReceived On 08/28/2019
2019-08-28SenatePassed Roll Call # 170 Yeas 29 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-06-20SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2019-06-20SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2019-06-20SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-06-11SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2019-06-11SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-06-11SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-05-16SenateReferred To Committee On Local Government
2019-05-16SenateIntroduced By Senator Roger Victory

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback