MI HB5599 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-28 - Assigned Pa 380'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-28 - Assigned Pa 380'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; underground storage tanks; cleanups and financial responsibility; modify requirements. Amends secs. 21502, 21503, 21508, 21510, 21510a, 21510c, 21515, 21516, 21521 & 21526 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.21502 et seq.) & adds sec. 21510d.
Title
Environmental protection; underground storage tanks; cleanups and financial responsibility; modify requirements. Amends secs. 21502, 21503, 21508, 21510, 21510a, 21510c, 21515, 21516, 21521 & 21526 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.21502 et seq.) & adds sec. 21510d.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 632 (Y: 80 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 714 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 351 (Y: 90 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 714 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 351 (Y: 90 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 380'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2016 @ 3:46 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/21/2016 @ 7:46 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2016 @ 11:08 Am |
2016-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-13 | House | Roll Call # 632 Yeas 80 Nays 28 |
2016-12-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2016-12-08 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-12-08 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 714 Yeas 27 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2016-06-01 | House | Transmitted |
2016-06-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 351 Yeas 90 Nays 19 |
2016-06-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-31 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-31 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-05-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-05-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-04-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/26/2016 |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2016-04-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-04-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrea Lafontaine |