MI HB4853 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Assigned Pa 89'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Assigned Pa 89'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Records: vital records; waiver of vital record fee for certain individuals; provide for. Amends sec. 2891 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2891).
Title
Records: vital records; waiver of vital record fee for certain individuals; provide for. Amends sec. 2891 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2891).
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Brann [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 207 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 198 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 198 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | House | Assigned Pa 89'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-10-08 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/07/2019 02:58 Pm |
2019-10-08 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/07/2019 10:10 Am |
2019-10-02 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/01/2019 04:19 Pm |
2019-09-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-09-19 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 207 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-09-11 | House | Transmitted |
2019-09-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 198 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-09-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-09-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-09-10 | House | Amended |
2019-09-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-09-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-09-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-08-29 | House | Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-08-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/29/2019 |
2019-08-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2019-08-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-08-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Tommy Brann |