MI HB4700 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-27 - Assigned Pa 95'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-27 - Assigned Pa 95'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; school districts; certain requirements regarding disclosure of information for certain public schools that provide medical benefit plans for employees; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1255a.
Title
Education; school districts; certain requirements regarding disclosure of information for certain public schools that provide medical benefit plans for employees; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1255a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 403 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 (Y: 80 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 (Y: 80 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-27 | House | Assigned Pa 95'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-07-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/15/2011 @ 2:34 Pm |
2011-07-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 7/15/2011 @ 9:43 Am |
2011-07-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 7/6/2011 @ 3:52 Pm |
2011-06-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-06-30 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-06-30 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 403 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-06-23 | House | Transmitted |
2011-06-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 Yeas 80 Nays 30 |
2011-06-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-06-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-06-22 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2011-06-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-06-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-06-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2011-06-01 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/01/2011 |
2011-05-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2011-05-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-05-31 | House | Introduced By Representative Deb Shaughnessy |
Same As/Similar To
SB0400 (Same As) 2011-06-22 - Referred To Committee On Education
Subjects
Education, employees
Education, intermediate school districts
Education, public school academies
Education, school districts
Insurance, health
Labor, collective bargaining
Labor, public service employment
Education, intermediate school districts
Education, public school academies
Education, school districts
Insurance, health
Labor, collective bargaining
Labor, public service employment