MI HB4589 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-22 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-22 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State; symbol; wild turkey; designate as the official state game bird. Creates new act.
Title
State; symbol; wild turkey; designate as the official state game bird. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Howell [R] | Rep. Rodney Wakeman [R] | Rep. Gary Eisen [R] | Rep. Bradley Slagh [R] |
Rep. Daire Rendon [R] | Rep. Laurie Pohutsky [D] | Rep. Sara Cambensy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-05-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/16/2019 |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2019-05-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced By Representative John Reilly |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4589 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4589.htm |