MI HB4243 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: controlled substances; crime of manufacturing, delivering, or possession of with intent to deliver heroin or fentanyl; modify to reflect changes in sentencing guidelines. Amends sec. 7401 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7401).
Title
Crimes: controlled substances; crime of manufacturing, delivering, or possession of with intent to deliver heroin or fentanyl; modify to reflect changes in sentencing guidelines. Amends sec. 7401 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7401).
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Alexander [R] | Sen. Joseph Bellino [R] | Rep. Graham Filler [R] | Rep. Robert Bezotte [R] |
Rep. Richard Steenland [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 92 (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2021-03-25 | House | Transmitted |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 92 Yeas 103 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-03-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/16/2021 |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness |
2021-02-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Alexander |