ME LD917 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - LD 917 In Senate, June 7, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - LD 917 In Senate, June 7, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Require a Review of the State Employee and Teacher Retirement Plan
Title
Resolve, To Require a Review of the State Employee and Teacher Retirement Plan
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Winsor [R] | Sen. James Hamper [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #241 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #240 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #240 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | LD 917 In Senate, June 7, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2017-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 240V 142 having voted in the affirmative and 3 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Resolve become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2017-06-06 | House | This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Resolve become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-05-24 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2017-05-23 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-184) in concurrence |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-184) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-17 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-184). |
2017-05-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-07 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |