ME LD846 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Transportation To Study Ways To Reduce Energy Use and Promote Efficiency along Major Transportation Corridors
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Transportation To Study Ways To Reduce Energy Use and Promote Efficiency along Major Transportation Corridors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2009-05-07 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-07 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 62 (Yeas 88 - Nays 51 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) | |
2009-05-07 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-05-05 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence | |
2009-05-05 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-30 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-30 | (S) On motion by Senator DAMON of Hancock Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2009-04-29 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) The Resolve was READ ONCE. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 36 (Yeas 93 - Nays 53 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) | |
2009-04-28 | (H) On motion of Representative MAZUREK of Rockland the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-03-10 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-10 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Sent down for concurrence | |
2009-03-05 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-03-03 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-03-03 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE | |
2009-03-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-03 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on MAINE'S ENERGY FUTURE. | |
2009-03-03 | (H) Joint Select Committee on Maine's Energy Future suggested and ordered printed. |