ME LD525 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Direct the Department of Health and Human Services To Report on Efforts To Reach in Rural Areas Persons Who Are Elderly, Disabled or Mentally Ill
Title
Resolve, To Direct the Department of Health and Human Services To Report on Efforts To Reach in Rural Areas Persons Who Are Elderly, Disabled or Mentally Ill
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Davis [R] | Rep. Norman Higgins [I] | Sen. David C. Burns [R] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] |
Rep. Paul Stearns [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #107 (Y: 132 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #93 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #58 (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #93 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #58 (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 107V 132 having voted in the affirmative and 13 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2015-05-28 | House | This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-05-27 | Senate | LD 525 In Senate, May 27, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 In Favor and 1 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-12 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-05-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-07 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-05-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-05-07 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2015-05-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 58 (Yeas 96 - Nays 43 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2015-05-07 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-05-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-02-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-26 | House | Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2015-02-26 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |