ME LD325 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Repeal Provisions of the Law That Apply or Refer to State Facilities for Persons with Intellectual Disabilities
Title
An Act To Repeal Provisions of the Law That Apply or Refer to State Facilities for Persons with Intellectual Disabilities
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D] | Sen. James Hamper [R] | Rep. Richard Malaby [R] | Rep. Deborah Sanderson [R] |
Rep. Heather Sirocki [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-03-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-03-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-03-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-02-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed, in concurrence. |
2013-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-07 | House | On motion of Representative PRIEST of Brunswick, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed. |