ME LD2149 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Exempt Seasonal Volunteer Ski Patrollers and Seasonal Volunteer Ski Ambassadors and Hosts at Ski Areas from the Minimum Wage Laws
Title
An Act to Exempt Seasonal Volunteer Ski Patrollers and Seasonal Volunteer Ski Ambassadors and Hosts at Ski Areas from the Minimum Wage Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator TIPPING of Penobscot The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-19 | House | On motion of Representative ROEDER of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-03-15 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2024-01-30 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-01-30 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2024-01-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2024-01-03 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |