ME LD2066 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Clarify Liability Under the Uncontrolled Hazardous Substance Site Law and to Waive a Fee Regarding Voluntary Response Action Plans
Title
An Act to Clarify Liability Under the Uncontrolled Hazardous Substance Site Law and to Waive a Fee Regarding Voluntary Response Action Plans
Sponsors
Rep. Jessica Fay [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-02-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-748), in concurrence. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-748) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-02-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2024-02-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-748). |
2024-02-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-02-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-02-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-01-31 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-01-31 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2024-01-11 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-01-11 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-12-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2023-12-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 11, 2023. |