ME LD1770 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Encourage Parental Involvement in Education
Title
An Act To Encourage Parental Involvement in Education
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Alfond [D] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Rep. Stephen Lovejoy [D] | Rep. Michael Mcclellan [R] |
Rep. Mary Nelson [D] | Rep. Helen Rankin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-448) | |
2012-03-21 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2012-03-21 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-03-20 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-448). | |
2012-03-20 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-448) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-01-11 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-01-11 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. | |
2012-01-11 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | |
2012-01-11 | (S) On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed. | |
2012-01-11 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2012-01-11 | (S) Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |