ME LD1596 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Summary
An Act Regarding Mobile Service Bars at Municipal Golf Courses
Title
An Act Regarding Mobile Service Bars at Municipal Golf Courses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-352) | |
2010-02-09 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2010-02-02 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-02-02 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-352) Roll Call Ordered (Remarks Made) Roll Call # 268 29 Yeas - 4 Nays- 2 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2010-02-02 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-01-28 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-01-28 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-352) Roll Call Requested | |
2010-01-28 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-352) | |
2010-01-28 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-352) | |
2010-01-28 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2010-01-28 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-01-26 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-01-26 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-352) READ and ADOPTED | |
2010-01-26 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-01-26 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED |