ME LD1147 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Direct the Commissioner of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife To Study Registration Fees for All-terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Title
Resolve, To Direct the Commissioner of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife To Study Registration Fees for All-terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Stearns [R] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] | Rep. Sherman Hutchins [R] | Sen. Lisa Keim [R] |
Sen. Peter Lyford [R] | Rep. Stephen Stanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-09 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-184), in concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-184) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-184). |
2019-05-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence |
2019-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |