MD SB93 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from $5,000 to $25,000, the maximum estimated cost in labor and materials for the alteration of a certain existing building or structure for which a person is not required to employ a licensed architect under certain circumstances; and altering the circumstances under which a person is not required to employ a licensed architect.
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB294 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Occupations and Professions | 3 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Occupations and Professions | 3 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |