MD SB920 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 526
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 526
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish a certain process for granting presumptive eligibility for a subsidy under the Child Care Scholarship Program; requiring the Department to award a certain subsidy to an individual who submits certain proof; prohibiting the Department or the Comptroller from seeking reimbursement or repayment of a certain subsidy from certain individuals under certain circumstances, except for cases of suspected fraud; etc.
Title
Early Childhood Development - Child Care Scholarship Program - Alterations and Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 526 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2022-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {643920/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Floor Amendment {593120/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {553322/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-11 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB995 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 525
Subjects
Child Care
Child Custody
Children
Comptroller
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Federal Aid
Food
Forms
Grants
Health
Housing
Job Training
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Poverty
Social Security
State Aid
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Women
Child Custody
Children
Comptroller
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Federal Aid
Food
Forms
Grants
Health
Housing
Job Training
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Poverty
Social Security
State Aid
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Women