MD SB908 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing State transportation goals; establishing measures by which the Department of Transportation is required to score the extent to which major capital projects satisfy the goals; requiring the Department to evaluate, score, and rank specified projects for inclusion in the draft and final Consolidated Transportation Program; requiring, with a specified exception, that capital projects with higher scores be ranked ahead of capital projects with lower scores; etc.
Title
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Bicycles
Bridges and Tunnels
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Construction
Counties
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Mass Transit
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources, Department of
Pedestrians
Planning, Department of
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Smart Growth
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Water
Work, Labor and Employment
Bridges and Tunnels
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Construction
Counties
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Mass Transit
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources, Department of
Pedestrians
Planning, Department of
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Smart Growth
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Water
Work, Labor and Employment