MD SB871 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an educational accountability program to include at least three school quality indicators that measure the comparative opportunities provided to students or the level of student success in public schools; prohibiting the school quality indicators from being based on student testing; requiring the State Board to establish a composite score that provides for a meaningful differentiation of schools under the school accountability system: authorizing a specified plan to include a lengthening of the school year; etc.
Title
Education - Accountability - Consolidated State Plan and Support and Improvement Plans (Protect Our Schools Act of 2017)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order Until 3/24 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order Until 3/24 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-15) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {893426/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {663924/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {753829/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {223327/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {654138/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {654138/1 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {654138/1 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-31) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {654138/1 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Assessments
Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Students
Teachers
Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Students
Teachers