MD SB869 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying a property owner's right to receive information on the calculation of an assessment; requiring owners of certain buildings to provide certain information to the supervisor of assessments within 90 days after construction of the buildings is completed; creating a subclass of real property consisting of improvements on agricultural land; requiring improvements on agricultural land to be assessed in a certain manner; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Improvements on Agricultural Land - Assessment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB640 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Agritourism
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Animals
Assessments
Construction
Education
Electronic Documents
Electronic Government
Farmland
Forms
internet
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Property Tax
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Sunset
Taxes - Property
Time
Weights and Measures
Agriculture, Department of
Agritourism
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Animals
Assessments
Construction
Education
Electronic Documents
Electronic Government
Farmland
Forms
internet
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Property Tax
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Sunset
Taxes - Property
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 1 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 14 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 5 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 8 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 8 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 8 | 209.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0869?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0869f.pdf |