MD SB868 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Career and Technology Education Committee; requiring the Committee to establish certain statewide goals for career and technical education; stating the purpose of the Career and Technology Education Innovation Grant in fiscal years 2021 or 2022; requiring the Committee to administer the Career and Technology Education Innovation Grant; extending the termination date for a certain tax credit; etc.
Title
Apprenticeship Maryland 2030
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Finance) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Age
Apprentices
Appropriations
Budgets
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Facilities and Services
Continuing Education
Contracts
Counties
Curriculum
Education
Grants
Industry and Technology
Labor, Department of
Licenses
Partnerships
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset
Tax Credits
Teachers
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Apprentices
Appropriations
Budgets
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Facilities and Services
Continuing Education
Contracts
Counties
Curriculum
Education
Grants
Industry and Technology
Labor, Department of
Licenses
Partnerships
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset
Tax Credits
Teachers
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Education | 21 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 21 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 21 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 21 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |