MD SB824 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue a Class C beer, wine, and liquor license to a club in the 45th alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City under certain circumstances.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {624638/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |