MD SB811 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 797
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 797
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date of specified provisions of law altering specified surcharges on specified fees, charges, and costs in specified civil cases and requiring a specified informational budget to be prepared for the Maryland Legal Services Corporation and submitted to the General Assembly.
Title
Civil Cases - Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund - Surcharges - Repeal of Sunset
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Zirkin [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] |
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 797 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-2) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-7) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |