MD SB783 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the West North Avenue Development Authority in Baltimore City to support the development and approval of a comprehensive neighborhood revitalization plan in the target area and the buffer zone; requiring membership of the Authority to include two members who are residents of communities impacted by the target area or buffer zone; authorizing the Authority to modify the boundaries of the target area and the buffer zone; requiring a report by the Authority on its comprehensive revitalization strategy by October 1, 2023; etc.
Title
Baltimore City – West North Avenue Development Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {360912/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {327877/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1293 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Economic and Community Development
Higher Education
Housing
Maps and Charts
Motor Vehicles
Pedestrians
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Transportation
Voting
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Economic and Community Development
Higher Education
Housing
Maps and Charts
Motor Vehicles
Pedestrians
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Transportation
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 12 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |