MD SB773 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the State income tax on corporations; and terminating the Act at the end of December 31, 2013.
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | Re-assigned Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0773.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0773f.pdf |