MD SB711 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing obsolete language regarding chemical information lists submitted to the Department of the Environment; requiring specified employers that cease to operate as a business or to take specified actions related to hazardous chemicals to submit a chemical information list to the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation (DLLR); requiring the DLLR to keep the chemical information list for at least 40 years; requiring an employer or the DLLR to provide specified access to specified information; etc.
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - Submission, Maintenance, and Accessibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) |
2014-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {523695/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-18 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {177073/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Disclosure
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Occupational Safety
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Information
Records
Work, Labor and Employment
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Occupational Safety
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Information
Records
Work, Labor and Employment