MD SB673 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the authority of the Secretary of Natural Resources with respect to hiring, promoting, and transferring employees of the Natural Resources Police Force; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to include advertising that is targeted toward certain underrepresented racial and ethnic communities when advertising for or recruiting new Natural Resources police officers; requiring the Natural Resources Police Force to submit a report on a certain action plan to the General Assembly by December 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Natural Resources Police Force - Employees - Authority of Secretary
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-2) |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-03-29 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {523724/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Contracts
Demographics
Discipline
Discrimination
Education
internet
Law Enforcement
Managers and Supervisors
Minorities
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
News Media
Radio
Reports
Residency
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor, and Employment
Contracts
Demographics
Discipline
Discrimination
Education
internet
Law Enforcement
Managers and Supervisors
Minorities
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
News Media
Radio
Reports
Residency
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 1 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 1 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 1 | 201.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 1 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 1 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |