MD SB654 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a memorandum of understanding agreed to and ratified under certain provisions of law from expiring until it is succeeded by a memorandum of understanding agreed to and ratified under a certain provision of the law; requiring that the terms of a certain memorandum of understanding continue in force and effect until a certain memorandum of understanding is agreed to and ratified; authorizing an exclusive representative to file a certain action in a circuit court under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Collective Bargaining - Memorandum of Understanding - Continuation
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] |
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-47) (Y: 90 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {653029/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {653029/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26 |
2018-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-47) |
2018-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-14) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Floor Amendment {653029/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-31) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Bates) Adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {957671/1 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {957671/1 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |