MD SB65 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB168

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "qualifying biomass" for purposes of excluding energy derived from certain material from being eligible for meeting certain Tier 1 obligations under the renewable energy portfolio standard; providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act; and applying the Act to all renewable energy portfolio standard compliance years beginning January 1, 2022, or later.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Tier 2 Renewable Sources, Qualifying Biomass, and Compliance Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Floor Amendment 573228/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Floor Amendment 463925/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (94-40)
2021-04-12HouseConference Committee Report {773029/1 Adopted
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (33-11)
2021-04-12SenateConference Committee Report {773029/1 Adopted
2021-04-12SenateHouse Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates D.E. Davis, Dumais and Brooks)
2021-04-12SenateHouse Refuses Recede
2021-04-12HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates D.E. Davis, Dumais and Brooks)
2021-04-12HouseHouse Refuses Recede
2021-04-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Augustine and Hershey)
2021-04-12HouseSenate Requests House Recede
2021-04-12HouseSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2021-04-12SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Augustine and Hershey)
2021-04-12SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2021-04-12SenateSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2021-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (96-42)
2021-04-07HouseMotion Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
2021-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {773192/1 Adopted
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2021-02-11HouseReferred Economic Matters
2021-02-09SenateThird Reading Passed (32-15)
2021-02-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-05SenateFloor Amendment {573228/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (15-30)
2021-02-05SenateFloor Amendment {463925/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-30)
2021-02-05SenateFloor Amendment {503726/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected
2021-02-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Adopted
2021-02-05SenateCommittee Amendment {957570/1 Adopted
2021-02-05SenateFavorable with Amendments
2021-02-03SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator King) Adopted
2021-02-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {957570/1
2021-02-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-12-23SenateHearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Finance
2020-10-30SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB168 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
HB875 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-19 - Referred Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities7701(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7704(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0065?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0065f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0065t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0065e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0065_95757001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0065_50372601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0065_46392501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0065_57322801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0065_77319201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0065_77302901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0065_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0065_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0157.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0158.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0169.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1345.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1522.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback