MD SB168 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB65
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "qualifying biomass" for purposes of excluding energy derived from certain material from being eligible for meeting certain Tier 1 obligations under the renewable energy portfolio standard; providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act; and applying the Act to all renewable energy portfolio standard compliance years beginning January 1, 2021, or later.
Title
Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB168 (Carry Over) 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
HB98 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
HB98 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Natural Resources
Renewable Energy Sources
Trees
Utility Regulation
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Natural Resources
Renewable Energy Sources
Trees
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |