MD SB636 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing for each permit to drill a gas well in deep shale deposits a presumptive impact area around the gas well; requiring a permittee to replace a water supply under specified circumstances; authorizing the permittee to avoid restoration under specified circumstances; prohibiting the Department of the Environment from requiring a permittee to replace a water supply or compensate an owner under specified circumstances; authorizing the Department to adopt regulations; etc.
Title
Environment - Presumptive Impact Areas - Contamination Caused by Gas Wells in
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Frosh [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-09 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2012-04-04 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (45-1) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments 654236/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing 3/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Damages
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Evidence
Fuel
Judicial Review
Licenses
Mining
Notices
Personal Property
Pollution
Real Property
Reparations
Rules and Regulations
Water
Wells
Damages
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Evidence
Fuel
Judicial Review
Licenses
Mining
Notices
Personal Property
Pollution
Real Property
Reparations
Rules and Regulations
Water
Wells