MD SB602 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-13)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-13)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council in the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention; requiring the Council to develop a statewide framework of sentencing and corrections policies to further reduce the State's incarcerated population, reduce spending on corrections and reinvest in strategies for specified purposes; requiring the Council to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015; etc.
Title
Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-10) (Y: 126 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-10) |
2015-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {318277/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Emergency Bills
Mediation
Public Safety
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Victims
Correctional Institutions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Emergency Bills
Mediation
Public Safety
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Victims