MD SB536 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding eligibility for the credit against the State income tax for certain film production activities to include certain digital animation projects; defining "digital animation project" as the creation, development, and production of computer-generated animation content for distribution or exhibition to the general public; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Digital Animation Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 118 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-12) |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {543420/1 Adopted |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 730 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |