MD SB480 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to administer, in fiscal years 2022 and 2023, child care stabilization grants to provide financial support to child care providers that have faced a financial hardship or suffered an operational burden during the COVID-19 pandemic; and providing for the priority in grant awards.
Title
State Department of Education - Child Care Stabilization Grants
Sponsors
Sen. Katie Hester [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-2) |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {243121/1 Adopted |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB89 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Subjects
Budgets
Child Care
Children
Criminal Background Investigations
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Governor
Grants
Job Training
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
Time
Weights and Measures
Child Care
Children
Criminal Background Investigations
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Governor
Grants
Job Training
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 5 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |