MD SB446 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that for the sale of dyed diesel fuel the sales and use tax is to be applied to a specified percentage of the gross receipts; defining specified terms; creating a collection exception for specified dyed diesel fuel sales by specified marinas; requiring specified marinas to assume or absorb the sales and use tax imposed on a retail sale or use and to pay that sales and use tax on behalf of the buyer; etc.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Sales of Dyed Diesel Fuel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-03-27 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-17 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |