MD SB434 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing additional funds to St. Mary's College of Maryland if specified funding is provided for specified wage increases for specified State employees in specified fiscal years; providing additional funds to the College to pay for the increase in State-supported health insurance costs of the College; stating the legislative intent regarding specified appropriations for the purpose of moderating undergraduate tuition cost increases at the College; etc.
Title
Higher Education - St. Mary's College of Maryland - Funding
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Stephen Waugh [R] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] |
Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Andrew Serafini [R] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {899339/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Grants
Higher Education
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Grants
Higher Education
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges