MD SB426 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 556
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 556
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the holder of a Class 9 limited distillery license and a 6-day Class D beer, wine, and liquor license to apply to the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to convert the existing Class D license to a 7-day Class D beer, wine, and liquor license in the 46th alcoholic beverages district; authorizing the Board to issue a Class B beer, wine, and liquor license and a Class D beer and light wine license in a certain area if a memorandum of understanding has been executed with Brewer's Hill Neighbors, Inc.; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - 46th District - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 556 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {384032/1 Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB572 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 555
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Communications
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Communications
License Commissioners, Boards of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |