MD HB572 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 555
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the holder of a Class 9 limited distillery license and a 6-day Class D beer, wine, and liquor license to apply to the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to convert the existing Class D license to a 7-day Class D beer, wine, and liquor license in the 46th alcoholic beverages district; authorizing the Board to issue a Class B beer, wine, and liquor license and a Class D beer and light wine license in a certain area if a memorandum of understanding has been executed with Brewer's Hill Neighbors, Inc.; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - 46th District - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 555
2021-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-08SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (130-1)
2021-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {403693/1 Adopted
2021-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2021-01-20HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB426 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 556

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2019(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages12102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages121406(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages121604(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages121605(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages12404(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback