MD SB363 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 203
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain State agencies to make available on their websites open meeting agendas 48 hours in advance of each meeting; requiring certain State agencies to post on their websites meeting minutes not more than 2 business days after the minutes are approved; requiring certain state agencies to maintain on their websites meeting minutes for 5 years and recordings for 1 year after the meeting; requiring the Department of Information Technology to provide certain staff, support, and equipment to the Maryland Transportation Authority; etc.
Title
State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 203 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (134-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {876086/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {794039/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB421 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 202
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Archives
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Corporations
Disclosure
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Industry and Technology
internet
Notices
Open Government
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Service Commission
Recordings
Records
Safety
Stadium Authority
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time
Transportation
Utilities
Video
Archives
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Corporations
Disclosure
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Industry and Technology
internet
Notices
Open Government
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Service Commission
Recordings
Records
Safety
Stadium Authority
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time
Transportation
Utilities
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 2 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 4 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 4 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |