MD HB421 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 202
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 202
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain State agencies to make publicly available on their websites open meeting agendas 48 hours in advance of each meeting or, under certain circumstances, as far in advance of the meeting as practicable; requiring certain State agencies to post on their websites certain meeting minutes not more than 2 business days after the minutes are approved; requiring certain State agencies to maintain on their websites meeting minutes for 5 years and video recordings and certain audio recordings for a minimum of 1 year after a meeting; etc.
Title
State Government – Open Meetings – Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act
(Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 202 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {346787/1 Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB363 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 203
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Archives
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Corporations
Disclosure
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Equipment
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Notices
Open Government
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Service Commission
Recordings
Records
Safety
Stadium Authority
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time
Transportation
Utilities
Video
Work, Labor and Employment
Archives
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Corporations
Disclosure
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Equipment
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Notices
Open Government
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Service Commission
Recordings
Records
Safety
Stadium Authority
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time
Transportation
Utilities
Video
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 2 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 4 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 4 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |