MD SB311 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB706
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-06 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-06 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to adopt regulations to ensure that children with disabilities who need special education and related services that cannot be provided in a public county, regional, or State program be placed in an appropriate nonpublic educational program that offers these services; requiring the State and certain counties to pay for costs of salaries for teachers at certain nonpublic schools in a certain amount and proportion; etc.
Title
Nonpublic Education - Placements of Children With Disabilities - Teacher Salaries (Teacher Pay Parity Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {633029/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {373128/1 Adopted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB706 (Carry Over) 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
HB448 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
HB448 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Subjects
Budgets
Communications
Counties
Disabilities
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Special Education
Teachers
Time
Communications
Counties
Disabilities
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Special Education
Teachers
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 8 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 8 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 8 | 415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |