MD SB706 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB311
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include for fiscal years 2023 and 2024 $4,000,000 in the annual budget bill to the State Department of Education to support the operations of the nonpublic educational programs for children with disabilities; requiring the Department to distribute the funds each year to each nonpublic educational program in an equal amount for each teacher employed by the nonpublic educational program; requiring the Department to submit a certain report by October 15, 2023; etc.
Title
Nonpublic Educational Programs - Children With Disabilities - Costs of Teacher Salaries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {193824/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB706 (Carry Over) 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1301 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-22 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1301 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-22 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Counties
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Teachers
Budgets
Counties
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Teachers