MD SB311 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB169
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the term "podiatrist" to be "podiatric physician".
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB169 (Carry Over) 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
HB790 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB790 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Health Occupations
Laws and Ordinances
Names
Physicians
Podiatrists
Rules and Regulations
State Documents
Health Occupations
Laws and Ordinances
Names
Physicians
Podiatrists
Rules and Regulations
State Documents