MD SB169 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB311
Note: Carry Over of previous HB428
Note: Carry Over of previous HB428
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the term "podiatrist" to be "podiatric physician"; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB169 (Carry Over) 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
HB182 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB428 (Carry Over) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
HB182 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB428 (Carry Over) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0169?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0169f.pdf |