MD SB177 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB233
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain licenses to manufacture, sell, buy, and store cigarettes, other tobacco products, and electronic smoking devices do not authorize the licensee to, or to attempt to, manufacture, ship, import, or sell into or within the State a flavored tobacco product; providing that a public statement that cigarettes, other tobacco products, or electronic smoking devices have or produce a certain smell or taste is presumptive evidence that they are flavored tobacco products if the statement is made by certain persons; etc.
Title
Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB134 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-20 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
SB233 (Carry Over) 2020-01-17 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
SB233 (Carry Over) 2020-01-17 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Communications
Consumer Protection
Emergency Bills
Fines
Health
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Retail Sales
Smoking and Vaping
Storage
Tobacco and Nicotine
Vending Machines
Commerce and Business
Communications
Consumer Protection
Emergency Bills
Fines
Health
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Retail Sales
Smoking and Vaping
Storage
Tobacco and Nicotine
Vending Machines
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 16 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 16 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 16 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 16 | 3A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 16 | 3A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 16 | 3A-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 5 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 5 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 7 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 7 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 7 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0177?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0177f.pdf |